Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2586 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2021

                    By: Thierry, et al. H.B. No. 2586
 (Senate Sponsor - Hall, Alvarado)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 3, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 3, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an annual audit of the independent organization
 certified for the ERCOT power region.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.159 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.159.  AUDIT OF INDEPENDENT ORGANIZATION CERTIFIED
 FOR ERCOT POWER REGION. (a) The commission annually shall have an
 independent audit made of each independent organization certified
 under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region.
 (b)  An audit under this section must examine:
 (1)  the independent organization's financial
 condition, including the organization's budget and expenses, and
 the salaries of the organization's employees and board members; and
 (2)  compliance of the independent organization's
 assets with all applicable commission standards.
 (c)  Not later than the 60th day after the date an audit under
 this section is completed the commission shall:
 (1)  publish the results of the audit on the
 commission's Internet website; and
 (2)  submit the results of the audit to the state
 auditor and members of the standing committees of the legislature
 with primary jurisdiction over the commission.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *