Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2607 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2607
1+By: Talarico, Button, Minjarez H.B. No. 2607
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Lucio, Hinojosa)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
4+ May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
5+ Resources & Economic Development; May 24, 2021, reported
6+ adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
7+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2607 By: Lucio
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Workforce Commission
615 and local workforce development boards regarding the provision of
716 child care and the subsidized child care program.
817 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
918 SECTION 1. Section 2308.3155, Government Code, is amended
1019 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2)
1120 to read as follows:
1221 (a) The Texas Rising Star Program is a [voluntary,]
1322 quality-based child care rating system of child care providers
1423 participating in the commission's subsidized child care program.
1524 (b-1) The rating system adopted under Subsection (b) must
1625 include an entry level rating for child care providers and a maximum
1726 length of time a provider may participate at the entry level rating.
1827 To qualify for the entry level rating a child care provider must
1928 meet the minimum quality standards that qualify the provider to
2029 receive technical assistance and support under the Texas Rising
2130 Star Program. A provider participating at the entry level rating is
2231 not eligible for increased reimbursement rates.
2332 (b-2) The commission shall develop a process to allow a
2433 child care provider to request a waiver to extend the length of time
2534 the provider may participate at the entry level rating described by
2635 Subsection (b-1). The waiver authorized by this subsection may not
2736 exceed 36 months.
2837 SECTION 2. Sections 302.0042(b) and (c), Labor Code, are
2938 amended to read as follows:
3039 (b) The commission's evaluation must assess:
3140 (1) the use of current federal child care funds by each
3241 local workforce development board;
3342 (2) the ability of each local workforce development
3443 board to meet child care performance measures;
3544 (3) the average cost of child care in each local
3645 workforce development area;
3746 (4) the average monthly price charged by child care
3847 providers for full-day child care in each local workforce
3948 development area as stated in the market rate survey conducted
4049 under 45 C.F.R. Section 98.45(c);
4150 (5) the average monthly price charged by quality child
4251 care providers for full-day child care in each local workforce
4352 development area;
4453 (6) the poverty rate of each local workforce
4554 development area compared to the state's poverty rate;
4655 (7) the number of children on waiting lists for child
4756 care in each local workforce development area;
4857 (8) the number of places that are reserved by each
4958 local workforce development board in contracts authorized under
5059 Section 302.0461 for participants in the child-care subsidy program
5160 out of the total number of children enrolled with a provider on a
5261 full-time basis categorized by age of the child for each provider in
5362 each local workforce development area that is certified as a
5463 2-star, 3-star, or 4-star provider in the Texas Rising Star Program
5564 or that does not participate in the Texas Rising Star Program;
5665 (9) the total number of child care providers
5766 participating in the Texas Rising Star Program in each local
5867 workforce development area and the number of 2-star, 3-star, and
5968 4-star rated child care providers in the local workforce
6069 development area;
6170 (10) the number of child care providers participating
6271 in the Texas Rising Star Program in each local workforce
6372 development area as a percentage of the total number of both
6473 subsidized child care providers and all child care providers in the
6574 local workforce development area;
6675 (11) the number of 2-star, 3-star, and 4-star rated
6776 child care providers in the local workforce development area as a
6877 percentage of the total number of both subsidized child care
6978 providers and all child care providers in the local workforce
7079 development area;
7180 (12) the total number of children enrolled in
7281 subsidized child care providers participating in the Texas Rising
7382 Star Program in each local workforce development area and the
7483 number of subsidized children enrolled in 2-star, 3-star, and
7584 4-star rated child care providers in the local workforce
7685 development area; [and]
7786 (13) the number of subsidized children enrolled in
7887 child care providers participating in the Texas Rising Star Program
7988 in each local workforce development area as a percentage of the
8089 total number of subsidized children enrolled in child care
8190 providers in the local workforce development area and the number of
8291 subsidized children enrolled in 2-star, 3-star, and 4-star rated
8392 child care providers in the local workforce development area as a
8493 percentage of the total number of subsidized children enrolled in
8594 child care providers in the local workforce development area; and
8695 (14) the number of 3-star and 4-star rated child care
8796 providers participating in partnerships with public school
8897 districts and public charter schools based on data provided by the
8998 Texas Education Agency, as necessary.
9099 (c) For the purposes of evaluation under this section, the
91100 commission shall annually update the information described by
92101 Subsections (b)(7)-(14) [(b)(7)-(13)].
93102 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 302, Labor Code, is
94103 amended by adding Section 302.00436 to read as follows:
95104 Sec. 302.00436. SUBSIDIZED CHILD CARE PROGRAM: INFORMATION
96105 FOR PUBLIC SCHOOLS. Each local workforce development board shall
97106 inform the local school districts and open-enrollment charter
98107 schools in the workforce development area regarding opportunities
99108 to partner with child-care providers in the board's area to expand
100109 access to and provide facilities for prekindergarten programs.
101110 SECTION 4. Section 302.0461(d), Labor Code, is amended to
102111 read as follows:
103112 (d) The commission shall determine the information that
104113 must be included in the report required by Subsection (c). A local
105114 workforce development board shall update the report required by
106115 Subsection (c) every 12 [six] months from the date the board submits
107116 its initial report to the commission.
108117 SECTION 5. The Texas Workforce Commission and local
109118 workforce development boards are required to implement a provision
110119 of this Act only if federal money is available for that purpose and
111120 using the federal money for that purpose would not result in
112121 supplanting or decreasing existing funding for programs currently
113122 funded by the Texas Workforce Commission using available federal
114123 money under the Child Care Development Block Grant. If the state
115124 does not receive sufficient additional federal money under the
116125 Child Care Development Block Grant or other federal money to
117126 implement a provision of this Act, the commission and the boards
118127 may, but are not required to, implement a provision of this Act
119128 using other appropriations available for that purpose.
120129 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
121- ______________________________ ______________________________
122- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
123- I certify that H.B. No. 2607 was passed by the House on April
124- 15, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 88, Nays 58, 1 present, not
125- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
126- No. 2607 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 88, Nays 58,
127- 1 present, not voting.
128- ______________________________
129- Chief Clerk of the House
130- I certify that H.B. No. 2607 was passed by the Senate, with
131- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays
132- 4.
133- ______________________________
134- Secretary of the Senate
135- APPROVED: __________________
136- Date
137- __________________
138- Governor
130+ * * * * *