|
06/16/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/28/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#587
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Record vote RV#563
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Record vote RV#562
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Slaton
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-Slaton
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 2-Slaton
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Record vote RV#561
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|