Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021