House | 05/05/2021 | Returned to committee | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c) | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Postponed | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Filed |