Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2728 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Martinez Fischer, Morales Shaw, Tinderholt H.B. No. 2728
 (Senate Sponsor - Johnson)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 11, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of January 27 as International
 Holocaust Remembrance Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.079 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.079.  INTERNATIONAL HOLOCAUST REMEMBRANCE DAY. (a)
 January 27 is International Holocaust Remembrance Day to
 commemorate the anniversary of the liberation of
 Auschwitz-Birkenau and to honor the millions of victims of the
 Holocaust.
 (b)  International Holocaust Remembrance Day may be
 regularly observed by appropriate ceremonies and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *