Senate | 05/10/2021 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Record vote RV#626 | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Amended 2-Tinderholt | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Amended 1-Tinderholt | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Filed |