Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2756 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: Allen, Bernal, Collier (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 2756
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the donation of food by public school campuses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.907, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 allow a campus to elect to donate food to a nonprofit organization
 through a person [an official of the nonprofit organization] who is
 directly and officially affiliated with the campus, including a
 teacher or [,] counselor, or through a parent of a student enrolled
 at the campus. The donated food may be received, stored, and
 distributed on the campus. Food donated by the campus may include:
 (1)  surplus food prepared for breakfast, lunch, or
 dinner meals or snacks [a snack to be] served from [at] the campus
 cafeteria, subject to any applicable local, state, and federal
 requirements; or
 (2)  food donated to the campus as the result of a food
 drive or similar event.
 (c)  The type of food donated under Subsection (b)(1) [this
 section] may include:
 (1)  packaged [or unpackaged] unserved food that is
 packaged on the campus of a school district or open-enrollment
 charter school and has not been removed from the campus cafeteria;
 (2)  packaged served food if the packaging and food are
 [is] in good condition;
 (3)  whole, uncut produce; and
 (4)  wrapped raw unserved produce[; and
 [(5)  unpeeled fruit required to be peeled before
 consumption].
 (c-1)  Food that by law must be maintained at a certain
 temperature for safety may not be donated unless the campus has
 maintained the food at the required temperature.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *