Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2756 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill May 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021