Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2757 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2757
1+By: Cyrier (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 2757
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
3+ May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1;
6+ May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2757 By: Lucio
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the conduct and promotion of charitable raffles.
614 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
715 SECTION 1. Section 2002.003(e), Occupations Code, is
816 amended to read as follows:
917 (e) A nonprofit wildlife conservation association and its
1018 local chapters, affiliates, wildlife cooperatives, or units are
1119 qualified nonprofit organizations under this chapter if the parent
1220 association meets the eligibility criteria under this section other
1321 than the requirement prescribed by Subsection (a)(3), (b)(3),
1422 (b-1)(3), or (c)(3), as applicable. An association or a local
1523 chapter, affiliate, wildlife cooperative, or unit that is eligible
1624 under this subsection may not use any proceeds from a raffle
1725 conducted under this chapter to attempt to influence legislation or
1826 participate or intervene in a political campaign on behalf of a
1927 candidate for public office in any manner, including by publishing
2028 or distributing a statement or making a campaign contribution. [A
2129 nonprofit wildlife conservation association may conduct two
2230 raffles each year and each local chapter, affiliate, wildlife
2331 cooperative, or unit may conduct two raffles each year under this
2432 chapter.] For purposes of this section, a nonprofit wildlife
2533 conservation association includes an association that supports
2634 wildlife, fish, or fowl.
2735 SECTION 2. Section 2002.052(b), Occupations Code, is
2836 amended to read as follows:
2937 (b) A raffle is not authorized by this chapter if the
3038 organization [sells or offers to sell tickets for or] awards prizes
3139 in the raffle in a calendar year in which the organization has
3240 previously [sold or offered to sell tickets for or] awarded prizes
3341 in four [two or more] other raffles. For purposes of this
3442 subsection, a raffle conducted in a preceding calendar year for
3543 which a prize or prizes are awarded on a later date set in
3644 accordance with Subsection (e) that occurs in a subsequent calendar
3745 year is not included in the number of raffles for which prizes are
3846 awarded by the organization in that subsequent calendar year.
3947 SECTION 3. Sections 2002.056(b) and (c), Occupations Code,
4048 are amended to read as follows:
4149 (b) Except as provided by Subsections (b-1) and (c), the
4250 value of a prize offered or awarded at a raffle that is purchased by
4351 the organization or for which the organization provides any
4452 consideration may not exceed $75,000 [$50,000].
4553 (c) A raffle prize may consist of one or more tickets in the
4654 state lottery authorized by Chapter 466, Government Code, with a
4755 face value of $75,000 [$50,000] or less, without regard to whether a
4856 prize in the lottery game to which the ticket or tickets relate
4957 exceeds $75,000 [$50,000].
5058 SECTION 4. Section 2002.052(c), Occupations Code, is
5159 repealed.
5260 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5361 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5462 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5563 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5664 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
57- ______________________________ ______________________________
58- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
59- I certify that H.B. No. 2757 was passed by the House on April
60- 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, 2 present, not
61- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
62- No. 2757 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 12,
63- 2 present, not voting.
64- ______________________________
65- Chief Clerk of the House
66- I certify that H.B. No. 2757 was passed by the Senate, with
67- amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays
68- 3.
69- ______________________________
70- Secretary of the Senate
71- APPROVED: __________________
72- Date
73- __________________
74- Governor
65+ * * * * *