Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2781 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 16, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021