Senate | 05/10/2021 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Record vote RV#438 | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Record vote RV#420 | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Amendment(s) offered 1-Slaton | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Filed |