Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2819 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 2819
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to temporary licenses for insurance professionals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4001.153, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 4001.153.  APPLICATION FOR AND ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY
 LICENSE. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), the [The]
 department shall issue a temporary license immediately on receipt
 of a properly completed application executed by the applicant in
 the form required by Section 4001.102 and accompanied by:
 (1)  the nonrefundable filing fee set by the
 department; and
 (2)  a certificate signed by an officer or properly
 authorized representative of an agent, insurer, or health
 maintenance organization stating that:
 (A)  the applicant is being considered for
 appointment by the agent, insurer, or health maintenance
 organization as its full-time agent;
 (B)  the agent, insurer, or health maintenance
 organization desires that the applicant be issued a temporary
 license; and
 (C)  the applicant will complete training as
 prescribed by Section 4001.160 under the agent's, insurer's, or
 health maintenance organization's supervision.
 (b)  The department may deny a license application under this
 subchapter if the department determines that any of the grounds
 exist for license denial or disciplinary action under Section
 4005.101, Insurance Code, or Chapter 53, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 4001.155, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 4001.155.  TERM OF TEMPORARY LICENSE. A temporary
 license is valid for 180 [90] days after the date of issuance.
 SECTION 3.  Section 4001.156(a), Insurance Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for a temporary insurance agent's license submitted
 on or after the effective date of this Act. An application for a
 temporary insurance agent's license submitted before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately
 before that date, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *