Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2840 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Longoria, Guerra (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2840
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inapplicability of state citrus fruit maturity
 standards to grapefruit and oranges processed for juice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 94.002, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 94.002.  EXCEPTIONS. Except to the extent specifically
 provided by this chapter, this chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  citrus fruit other than citrus grandis, osbeck,
 commonly known as grapefruit, and citrus sinensis, osbeck, commonly
 known as oranges;
 (2)  a sale of citrus fruit "on the trees";
 (3)  grapefruit that is shipped after December 1 of a
 year and before August 1 of the following year;
 (4)  early or midseason oranges that are shipped after
 November 1 of a year and before August 1 of the following year; [or]
 (5)  transportation of citrus fruit from a grove to a
 packing house located in this state; or
 (6)  grapefruit or oranges that are processed for
 juice.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *