Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2857 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2857
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2857 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain information regarding taxpayers subject to an
 audit that is provided to members of the public.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 111.0075, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 111.0075.  PROVISION [USE] OF INFORMATION RELATING TO
 TAX AUDITS.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 111.0075(a) and (b), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies to information that:
 (1)  relates to a taxpayer that the comptroller is
 auditing or intends to audit;
 (2)  is considered public information under Chapter
 552, Government Code; and
 (3)  is requested from [made available by] the
 comptroller by [to] a person [who requested that information] under
 Chapter 552, Government Code.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 552.221(a), Government Code,
 the comptroller may not provide [A person who obtains] information
 described by Subsection (a) of this section to a person other than
 the [and who is not a] taxpayer to whom the information relates
 earlier than the 14th day after the date the comptroller mails the
 notice of intent to audit to the taxpayer [may not, before the sixth
 day after the date the comptroller made the information available
 to the person, use the information for the direct solicitation of
 business or employment for pecuniary gain].
 SECTION 3.  Sections 111.0075(c), (d), (e), and (f), Tax
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 4.  The repeal by this Act of Section 111.0075(d),
 Tax Code, does not affect the imposition of a penalty under that
 section for conduct occurring before the effective date of this
 Act. For purposes of this section, conduct occurs before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the conduct subject to
 the imposition of the penalty occurs before that date. Conduct
 occurring before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect when the conduct occurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to information requested by a person under Chapter 552, Government
 Code, on or after the effective date of this Act.  Information
 requested before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the information was requested, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *