1 | | - | H.B. No. 2857 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2857 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2857 By: Hancock |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to certain information regarding taxpayers subject to an |
---|
6 | 14 | | audit that is provided to members of the public. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 111.0075, Tax Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 111.0075. PROVISION [USE] OF INFORMATION RELATING TO |
---|
11 | 19 | | TAX AUDITS. |
---|
12 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Sections 111.0075(a) and (b), Tax Code, are |
---|
13 | 21 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 22 | | (a) This section applies to information that: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (1) relates to a taxpayer that the comptroller is |
---|
16 | 24 | | auditing or intends to audit; |
---|
17 | 25 | | (2) is considered public information under Chapter |
---|
18 | 26 | | 552, Government Code; and |
---|
19 | 27 | | (3) is requested from [made available by] the |
---|
20 | 28 | | comptroller by [to] a person [who requested that information] under |
---|
21 | 29 | | Chapter 552, Government Code. |
---|
22 | 30 | | (b) Notwithstanding Section 552.221(a), Government Code, |
---|
23 | 31 | | the comptroller may not provide [A person who obtains] information |
---|
24 | 32 | | described by Subsection (a) of this section to a person other than |
---|
25 | 33 | | the [and who is not a] taxpayer to whom the information relates |
---|
26 | 34 | | earlier than the 14th day after the date the comptroller mails the |
---|
27 | 35 | | notice of intent to audit to the taxpayer [may not, before the sixth |
---|
28 | 36 | | day after the date the comptroller made the information available |
---|
29 | 37 | | to the person, use the information for the direct solicitation of |
---|
30 | 38 | | business or employment for pecuniary gain]. |
---|
31 | 39 | | SECTION 3. Sections 111.0075(c), (d), (e), and (f), Tax |
---|
32 | 40 | | Code, are repealed. |
---|
33 | 41 | | SECTION 4. The repeal by this Act of Section 111.0075(d), |
---|
34 | 42 | | Tax Code, does not affect the imposition of a penalty under that |
---|
35 | 43 | | section for conduct occurring before the effective date of this |
---|
36 | 44 | | Act. For purposes of this section, conduct occurs before the |
---|
37 | 45 | | effective date of this Act if any element of the conduct subject to |
---|
38 | 46 | | the imposition of the penalty occurs before that date. Conduct |
---|
39 | 47 | | occurring before the effective date of this Act is governed by the |
---|
40 | 48 | | law in effect when the conduct occurred, and the former law is |
---|
41 | 49 | | continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
42 | 50 | | SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
43 | 51 | | to information requested by a person under Chapter 552, Government |
---|
44 | 52 | | Code, on or after the effective date of this Act. Information |
---|
45 | 53 | | requested before the effective date of this Act is governed by the |
---|
46 | 54 | | law in effect on the date the information was requested, and the |
---|
47 | 55 | | former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
48 | 56 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2857 was passed by the House on April |
---|
52 | | - | 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 12, 2 present, not |
---|
53 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
54 | | - | No. 2857 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 10, |
---|
55 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
58 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2857 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
59 | | - | amendments, on May 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
60 | | - | 0. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
63 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Date |
---|
65 | | - | __________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 57 | + | * * * * * |
---|