1 | | - | H.B. No. 2920 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2920 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to a grace period for payment of premiums on insurance |
---|
6 | 12 | | policies renewed by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 2210.203, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 15 | | adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (c-1) With the advice of the association, the commissioner |
---|
11 | 17 | | shall adopt rules establishing a grace period of not more than 10 |
---|
12 | 18 | | days after the due date for the receipt of payment of premium for |
---|
13 | 19 | | the renewal of a policy. |
---|
14 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Not later than June 1, 2022, the commissioner of |
---|
15 | 21 | | insurance, with the advice of the Texas Windstorm Insurance |
---|
16 | 22 | | Association, shall adopt rules as required by Section |
---|
17 | 23 | | 2210.203(c-1), Insurance Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
18 | 24 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
19 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
20 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
21 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2920 was passed by the House on April |
---|
22 | | - | 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 3, 2 present, not |
---|
23 | | - | voting. |
---|
24 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
25 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
26 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2920 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
27 | | - | 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
28 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
29 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
30 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Date |
---|
32 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 25 | + | * * * * * |
---|