Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2926 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021