Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2941 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2021
Fiscal Note March 26, 2021