Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2954 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 25, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021