Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 10, 2021