Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3006 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 16, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021