House | 04/27/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Referred to Elections | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Filed |