Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3132 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 3132
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the performance of equine dentistry by students of
 equine dental provider certification programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 801.260, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 801.260.  REQUIREMENTS TO PERFORM [LICENSE REQUIRED
 FOR] EQUINE DENTISTRY. A person may not perform equine dentistry or
 offer or attempt to act as an equine dental provider unless the
 person is:
 (1)  a veterinarian who is active and in good standing;
 [or]
 (2)  a licensed equine dental provider who is active
 and in good standing performing under the supervision of a
 veterinarian who is active and in good standing; or
 (3)  a student of an equine dental provider
 certification program approved by the board who:
 (A)  is completing the practical requirements of
 the certification program; and
 (B)  performs equine dentistry under the direct
 supervision of a veterinarian who is active and in good standing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *