1 | | - | H.B. No. 3157 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Reynolds, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 3157 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
| 4 | + | Justice; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
9 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 39.04(b), Penal Code, is amended to read |
---|
10 | | - | as follows: |
---|
| 15 | + | SECTION 1. Sections 39.04(a) and (b), Penal Code, are |
---|
| 16 | + | amended to read as follows: |
---|
| 17 | + | (a) An official of a correctional facility or juvenile |
---|
| 18 | + | facility, an employee of a correctional facility or juvenile |
---|
| 19 | + | facility, a person other than an employee who works for |
---|
| 20 | + | compensation at a correctional facility or juvenile facility, a |
---|
| 21 | + | volunteer at a correctional facility or juvenile facility, or a |
---|
| 22 | + | peace officer commits an offense if the person intentionally: |
---|
| 23 | + | (1) denies or impedes a person in custody in the |
---|
| 24 | + | exercise or enjoyment of any right, privilege, or immunity [knowing |
---|
| 25 | + | his conduct is unlawful]; or |
---|
| 26 | + | (2) engages in sexual contact, sexual intercourse, or |
---|
| 27 | + | deviate sexual intercourse with an individual in custody or, in the |
---|
| 28 | + | case of an individual in the custody of the Texas Juvenile Justice |
---|
| 29 | + | Department or placed in a juvenile facility, employs, authorizes, |
---|
| 30 | + | or induces the individual to engage in sexual conduct or a sexual |
---|
| 31 | + | performance. |
---|
11 | 32 | | (b) An offense under Subsection (a)(1) is a felony of the |
---|
12 | 33 | | third degree [Class A misdemeanor]. An offense under Subsection |
---|
13 | 34 | | (a)(2) is a [state jail] felony of the second degree, except that an |
---|
14 | 35 | | offense under Subsection (a)(2) is a felony of the first [second] |
---|
15 | 36 | | degree if the offense is committed against: |
---|
16 | 37 | | (1) an individual in the custody of the Texas Juvenile |
---|
17 | 38 | | Justice Department or placed in a juvenile facility; or |
---|
18 | 39 | | (2) a juvenile offender detained in or committed to a |
---|
19 | 40 | | correctional facility. |
---|
20 | 41 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
21 | 42 | | to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
22 | 43 | | An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
23 | 44 | | governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, |
---|
24 | 45 | | and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For |
---|
25 | 46 | | purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the |
---|
26 | 47 | | effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred |
---|
27 | 48 | | before that date. |
---|
28 | 49 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
31 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3157 was passed by the House on May |
---|
32 | | - | 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
33 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
34 | | - | No. 3157 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, |
---|
35 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3157 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
39 | | - | amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays |
---|
40 | | - | 2. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
43 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Date |
---|
45 | | - | __________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 50 | + | * * * * * |
---|