Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3158 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021