Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3159 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 87R10332 JAM-F
22 By: Martinez H.B. No. 3159
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional
88 mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Section 223.201(b), Transportation Code, is
1111 transferred to Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
1212 redesignated as Section 223.2001, Transportation Code, and amended
1313 to read as follows:
1414 Sec. 223.2001. DEFINITION. [(b)] In this subchapter,
1515 "comprehensive development agreement" means an agreement that, at a
1616 minimum, provides for the design and construction, reconstruction,
1717 rehabilitation, expansion, or improvement of a project described in
1818 Section 223.201(a) [Subsection (a)] and may also provide for the
1919 financing, acquisition, maintenance, or operation of a project
2020 described in Section 223.201(a) [Subsection (a)].
2121 SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
2222 is amended by adding Section 223.2002 to read as follows:
2323 Sec. 223.2002. LIMITATION. The department may enter into a
2424 comprehensive development agreement only:
2525 (1) for specific projects authorized under this
2626 subchapter; or
2727 (2) as provided by Subchapter F.
2828 SECTION 3. Sections 223.201(f), (i), and (j),
2929 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
3030 (f) The department may enter into a comprehensive
3131 development agreement under this subchapter only for all or part
3232 of:
3333 (1) the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project;
3434 (2) the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project
3535 in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S.
3636 Highway 380;
3737 (3) the Interstate Highway 35W project in Tarrant
3838 County from Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114;
3939 (4) the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in
4040 Tarrant and Dallas Counties from State Highway 121 to Interstate
4141 Highway 35E;
4242 (5) the Interstate Highway 35E/U.S. Highway 67
4343 Southern Gateway project in Dallas County, including:
4444 (A) Interstate Highway 35E from 8th Street to
4545 Interstate Highway 20; and
4646 (B) U.S. Highway 67 from Interstate Highway 35E
4747 to Farm-to-Market Road 1382 (Belt Line Road);
4848 (6) the State Highway 288 project from U.S. Highway 59
4949 to south of State Highway 6 in Brazoria County and Harris County;
5050 (7) the U.S. Highway 290 managed lanes project in
5151 Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State Highway 99;
5252 (8) the Interstate Highway 820 project from State
5353 Highway 183 to Randol Mill Road;
5454 (9) the State Highway 114 project in Dallas County
5555 from State Highway 121 to State Highway 183;
5656 (10) the Loop 12 project in Dallas County from State
5757 Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 35E;
5858 (11) the Loop 9 project in Dallas and Ellis Counties
5959 from Interstate Highway 20 to U.S. Highway 67; [and]
6060 (12) the U.S. Highway 181 Harbor Bridge project in
6161 Nueces County between U.S. Highway 181 at Beach Avenue and
6262 Interstate Highway 37;
6363 (13) the Interstate Highway 35 project in Travis and
6464 Williamson Counties from State Highway 45 North to State Highway 45
6565 Southeast;
6666 (14) the Interstate Highway 45 North project in Harris
6767 County from Beltway 8 to Interstate Highway 10;
6868 (15) the Hempstead Managed Tollway project in Harris
6969 County from State Highway 99 to the Interstate Highway
7070 610/Interstate Highway 10 interchange;
7171 (16) the Interstate Highway 30 project in Tarrant
7272 County from Interstate Highway 35W to east of Fielder Road;
7373 (17) the Interstate Highway 635 East project in Dallas
7474 County from U.S. Highway 75 to Interstate Highway 30;
7575 (18) the Interstate Highway 35E project in Dallas and
7676 Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S. Highway 380;
7777 and
7878 (19) a project listed under Section 370.3051.
7979 (i) The department's authority to enter into a
8080 comprehensive development agreement expires:
8181 (1) August 31, 2017, for a project described in
8282 Subdivisions (1)-(12) of [by] Subsection (f), other than the State
8383 Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project and the State Highway 183
8484 managed lanes project; [and]
8585 (2) August 31, 2015, for the State Highway 183 managed
8686 lanes project; and
8787 (3) August 31, 2031, for a project described in
8888 Subdivisions (13)-(19) of Subsection (f).
8989 (j) Before the department may enter into a comprehensive
9090 development agreement under Subsection (f), the department must:
9191 (1) for a project other than the State Highway 99
9292 (Grand Parkway) project, obtain[, not later than August 31, 2017,]
9393 the appropriate environmental clearance:
9494 (A) for the project; or
9595 (B) for the initial or base scope of the project
9696 if the project agreement provides for the phased construction of
9797 the project; and
9898 (2) present to the commission a full financial plan
9999 for the project, including costing methodology and cost proposals.
100100 SECTION 4. Section 370.305(c), Transportation Code, is
101101 amended to read as follows:
102102 (c) An authority may enter into a comprehensive development
103103 agreement only:
104104 (1) for specific projects authorized under this
105105 subchapter; or
106106 (2) as provided by Subchapter K [Except as provided by
107107 this chapter, an authority's authority to enter into a
108108 comprehensive development agreement expires on August 31, 2011].
109109 SECTION 5. Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code,
110110 is amended by adding Section 370.3051 to read as follows:
111111 Sec. 370.3051. AUTHORIZED PROJECTS FOR COMPREHENSIVE
112112 DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS; EXPIRATION. (a) A regional mobility
113113 authority may enter into a comprehensive development agreement for:
114114 (1) the Interstate Highway 35 Northeast Expansion
115115 project, from Loop 410 South in Bexar County to Farm-to-Market Road
116116 1103 in Comal County;
117117 (2) the Loop 1604 project in Bexar County;
118118 (3) the Outer Parkway project in Cameron County from
119119 U.S. Highway 77 to Farm-to-Market Road 1847;
120120 (4) the South Padre Island Second Access Causeway
121121 project in Cameron County from State Highway 100 to Park Road 100;
122122 (5) the Farm-to-Market 1925 project from U.S. Highway
123123 281 in Hidalgo County to U.S. Highway 77 in Cameron County;
124124 (6) the Hidalgo County Loop project;
125125 (7) the International Bridge Trade Corridor project in
126126 Hidalgo County;
127127 (8) the State Highway 68 project in Hidalgo County;
128128 (9) the U.S. Highway 290 West project in Travis County
129129 from Loop 1 to Ranch-to-Market Road 1826 (Oak Hill Parkway);
130130 (10) the Loop 1 South project in Travis County from
131131 Cesar Chavez Street to Slaughter Lane; and
132132 (11) the Loop 49 project:
133133 (A) in Smith County from Interstate Highway 20 to
134134 U.S. Highway 69 (Lindale Relief Route); and
135135 (B) from State Highway 110 in Smith County to
136136 U.S. Highway 259 in Gregg County (Segments 6 and 7).
137137 (b) An authority's authority to enter into a comprehensive
138138 development agreement for a project listed in Subsection (a)
139139 expires August 31, 2031.
140140 SECTION 6. The following provisions of the Transportation
141141 Code are repealed:
142142 (1) Sections 223.201(k) and (m); and
143143 (2) Section 223.2011.
144144 SECTION 7. The changes in law made by this Act do not
145145 invalidate a comprehensive development agreement or facility
146146 agreement entered into under Subchapter E, Chapter 223,
147147 Transportation Code, before the effective date of this Act, and do
148148 not limit the Texas Department of Transportation's continued
149149 authority relating to those agreements. The prior law is continued
150150 in effect for the limited purpose of continuing to govern those
151151 agreements as applicable.
152152 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.