Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3162 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Martinez (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3162
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2021;
 May 18, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a certificate of merit in certain actions against
 certain licensed or registered professionals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 150.002, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection
 (i) to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (i), in [In] any action
 or arbitration proceeding for damages arising out of the provision
 of professional services by a licensed or registered professional,
 a claimant shall be required to file with the complaint an affidavit
 of a third-party licensed architect, licensed professional
 engineer, registered landscape architect, or registered
 professional land surveyor who:
 (1)  is competent to testify;
 (2)  holds the same professional license or
 registration as the defendant; and
 (3)  practices in the area of practice of the defendant
 and offers testimony based on the person's:
 (A)  knowledge;
 (B)  skill;
 (C)  experience;
 (D)  education;
 (E)  training; and
 (F)  practice.
 (i)  A third-party plaintiff that is a design-builder or
 design-build firm is not required to file an affidavit described by
 Subsection (a) in connection with filing a third-party claim or
 cross-claim against a licensed or registered professional if the
 action or arbitration proceeding arises out of a design-build
 project in which a governmental entity contracts with a single
 entity to provide both design and construction services for the
 construction, expansion, extension, rehabilitation, alteration, or
 repair of a facility, a building or associated structure, a civil
 works project, or a highway project.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an action commenced on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An action commenced before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *