Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3215 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2021

                    87R16214 JAM-F
 By: Geren H.B. No. 3215
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3215:
 By:  Anchia C.S.H.B. No. 3215


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to energy efficiency building standards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 388.003(i) and (j), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (i)  A building certified by a national, state, or local
 accredited energy efficiency program and determined by the
 laboratory to be in compliance with the energy efficiency
 requirements of this section may, at the option of the
 municipality, be considered in compliance.  The United States
 Environmental Protection Agency's Energy Star Program
 certification of energy code equivalency shall be considered in
 compliance.  Standard 301 of the American National Standard for the
 Calculation and Labeling of the Energy Performance of Dwelling and
 Sleeping Units using an Energy Rating Index, commonly cited as
 ANSI/RESNET/ICC 301, as it existed on January 1, 2021, [The Energy
 Rating Index Compliance Alternative or subsequent alternative
 compliance path as described by Subsection (j)] shall be considered
 in compliance.
 (j)  For the purposes of this chapter, Standard 301 of the
 American National Standard for the Calculation and Labeling of the
 Energy Performance of Dwelling and Sleeping Units using an Energy
 Rating Index, commonly cited as ANSI/RESNET/ICC 301, as it existed
 on January 1, 2021, [the Energy Rating Index Compliance Alternative
 or subsequent alternative compliance path] used to measure
 compliance for single-family residential construction in an
 optional compliance path of the energy efficiency chapter of the
 International Residential Code that uses an energy rating index is
 as follows:
 (1)  for climate zone 2, an energy rating index of:
 (A)  [65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to
 August 31, 2019;
 [(B)]  63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to
 August 31, 2022; and
 (B) [(C)]  59 or lower on or after September 1,
 2022;
 (2)  for climate zone 3, an energy rating index of:
 (A)  [65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to
 August 31, 2019;
 [(B)]  63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to
 August 31, 2022; and
 (B) [(C)]  59 or lower on or after September 1,
 2022; and
 (3)  for climate zone 4, an energy rating index of:
 (A)  [69 or lower from September 1, 2016, to
 August 31, 2019;
 [(B)]  67 or lower from September 1, 2019, to
 August 31, 2022; and
 (B) [(C)]  63 or lower on or after September 1,
 2022.
 SECTION 2.  Section 388.003(k), Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.