Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3215 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3215
1+By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3215
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
3+ May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
4+ Commerce; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to energy efficiency building standards.
612 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
713 SECTION 1. Sections 388.003(i), (j), and (k), Health and
814 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
915 (i) A building certified by a national, state, or local
1016 accredited energy efficiency program and determined by the
1117 laboratory to be in compliance with the energy efficiency
1218 requirements of this section may, at the option of the
1319 municipality, be considered in compliance. The United States
1420 Environmental Protection Agency's Energy Star Program
1521 certification of energy code equivalency shall be considered in
1622 compliance. A home energy rating system index utilizing Standard
1723 301 of the American National Standard for the Calculation and
1824 Labeling of the Energy Performance of Dwelling and Sleeping Units
1925 using an Energy Rating Index, commonly cited as ANSI/RESNET/ICC
2026 301, as it existed on January 1, 2021, [The Energy Rating Index
2127 Compliance Alternative or subsequent alternative compliance path]
2228 as described by Subsection (j) shall be considered in compliance
2329 provided that:
2430 (1) the building meets the mandatory requirements of
2531 Section R406.2 of the 2018 International Energy Conservation Code;
2632 and
2733 (2) the building thermal envelope is equal to or
2834 greater than the levels of efficiency and solar heat gain
2935 coefficient in Table R402.1.2 or Table R402.1.4 of the 2018
3036 International Energy Conservation Code.
3137 (j) For the purposes of this chapter, Standard 301 of the
3238 American National Standard for the Calculation and Labeling of the
3339 Energy Performance of Dwelling and Sleeping Units using an Energy
3440 Rating Index, commonly cited as ANSI/RESNET/ICC 301, as it existed
3541 on January 1, 2021, [the Energy Rating Index Compliance Alternative
3642 or subsequent alternative compliance path] used to measure
3743 compliance for single-family residential construction [in an
3844 optional compliance path of the energy efficiency chapter of the
3945 International Residential Code] that uses an energy rating index is
4046 as follows:
4147 (1) for climate zone 2, an energy rating index of:
4248 (A) [65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to
4349 August 31, 2019;
4450 [(B)] 63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to
4551 August 31, 2022; [and]
4652 (B) [(C)] 59 or lower on or after September 1,
4753 2022;
4854 (C) 57 or lower on or after September 1, 2025; and
4955 (D) 55 or lower on or after September 1, 2028;
5056 (2) for climate zone 3, an energy rating index of:
5157 (A) [65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to
5258 August 31, 2019;
5359 [(B)] 63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to
5460 August 31, 2022; [and]
5561 (B) [(C)] 59 or lower on or after September 1,
5662 2022; [and]
5763 (C) 57 or lower on or after September 1, 2025; and
5864 (D) 55 or lower on or after September 1, 2028; and
5965 (3) for climate zone 4, an energy rating index of:
6066 (A) [69 or lower from September 1, 2016, to
6167 August 31, 2019;
6268 [(B)] 67 or lower from September 1, 2019, to
6369 August 31, 2022; [and]
6470 (B) [(C)] 63 or lower on or after September 1,
6571 2022;
6672 (C) 61 or lower on or after September 1, 2025; and
6773 (D) 59 or lower on or after September 1, 2028.
6874 (k) This subsection and Subsection (j) expire September 1,
6975 2031 [2025].
7076 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
71- ______________________________ ______________________________
72- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
73- I certify that H.B. No. 3215 was passed by the House on May 5,
74- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 1, 1 present, not
75- voting.
76- ______________________________
77- Chief Clerk of the House
78- I certify that H.B. No. 3215 was passed by the Senate on May
79- 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
80- ______________________________
81- Secretary of the Senate
82- APPROVED: _____________________
83- Date
84- _____________________
85- Governor
77+ * * * * *