Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3215 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/05/2021

                    By: Geren H.B. No. 3215


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to energy efficiency building standards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 388.003(i), (j), and (k), Health and
 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (i)  A building certified by a national, state, or local
 accredited energy efficiency program and determined by the
 laboratory to be in compliance with the energy efficiency
 requirements of this section may, at the option of the
 municipality, be considered in compliance.  The United States
 Environmental Protection Agency's Energy Star Program
 certification of energy code equivalency shall be considered in
 compliance.  A home energy rating system index utilizing Standard
 301 of the American National Standard for the Calculation and
 Labeling of the Energy Performance of Dwelling and Sleeping Units
 using an Energy Rating Index, commonly cited as ANSI/RESNET/ICC
 301, as it existed on January 1, 2021, [The Energy Rating Index
 Compliance Alternative or subsequent alternative compliance path]
 as described by Subsection (j) shall be considered in compliance
 provided that:
 (1)  the building meets the mandatory requirements of
 Section R406.2 of the 2018 International Energy Conservation Code;
 and
 (2)  the building thermal envelope is equal to or
 greater than the levels of efficiency and solar heat gain
 coefficient in Table R402.1.2 or Table R402.1.4 of the 2018
 International Energy Conservation Code.
 (j)  For the purposes of this chapter, Standard 301 of the
 American National Standard for the Calculation and Labeling of the
 Energy Performance of Dwelling and Sleeping Units using an Energy
 Rating Index, commonly cited as ANSI/RESNET/ICC 301, as it existed
 on January 1, 2021, [the Energy Rating Index Compliance Alternative
 or subsequent alternative compliance path] used to measure
 compliance for single-family residential construction [in an
 optional compliance path of the energy efficiency chapter of the
 International Residential Code] that uses an energy rating index is
 as follows:
 (1)  for climate zone 2, an energy rating index of:
 (A)  [65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to
 August 31, 2019;
 [(B)]  63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to
 August 31, 2022; [and]
 (B) [(C)]  59 or lower on or after September 1,
 2022;
 (C)  57 or lower on or after September 1, 2025; and
 (D)  55 or lower on or after September 1, 2028;
 (2)  for climate zone 3, an energy rating index of:
 (A)  [65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to
 August 31, 2019;
 [(B)]  63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to
 August 31, 2022; [and]
 (B) [(C)]  59 or lower on or after September 1,
 2022; [and]
 (C)  57 or lower on or after September 1, 2025; and
 (D)  55 or lower on or after September 1, 2028; and
 (3)  for climate zone 4, an energy rating index of:
 (A)  [69 or lower from September 1, 2016, to
 August 31, 2019;
 [(B)]  67 or lower from September 1, 2019, to
 August 31, 2022; [and]
 (B) [(C)]  63 or lower on or after September 1,
 2022;
 (C)  61 or lower on or after September 1, 2025; and
 (D)  59 or lower on or after September 1, 2028.
 (k)  This subsection and Subsection (j) expire September 1,
 2031 [2025].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.