By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3215 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021; May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to energy efficiency building standards. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 388.003(i), (j), and (k), Health and Safety Code, are amended to read as follows: (i) A building certified by a national, state, or local accredited energy efficiency program and determined by the laboratory to be in compliance with the energy efficiency requirements of this section may, at the option of the municipality, be considered in compliance. The United States Environmental Protection Agency's Energy Star Program certification of energy code equivalency shall be considered in compliance. A home energy rating system index utilizing Standard 301 of the American National Standard for the Calculation and Labeling of the Energy Performance of Dwelling and Sleeping Units using an Energy Rating Index, commonly cited as ANSI/RESNET/ICC 301, as it existed on January 1, 2021, [The Energy Rating Index Compliance Alternative or subsequent alternative compliance path] as described by Subsection (j) shall be considered in compliance provided that: (1) the building meets the mandatory requirements of Section R406.2 of the 2018 International Energy Conservation Code; and (2) the building thermal envelope is equal to or greater than the levels of efficiency and solar heat gain coefficient in Table R402.1.2 or Table R402.1.4 of the 2018 International Energy Conservation Code. (j) For the purposes of this chapter, Standard 301 of the American National Standard for the Calculation and Labeling of the Energy Performance of Dwelling and Sleeping Units using an Energy Rating Index, commonly cited as ANSI/RESNET/ICC 301, as it existed on January 1, 2021, [the Energy Rating Index Compliance Alternative or subsequent alternative compliance path] used to measure compliance for single-family residential construction [in an optional compliance path of the energy efficiency chapter of the International Residential Code] that uses an energy rating index is as follows: (1) for climate zone 2, an energy rating index of: (A) [65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to August 31, 2019; [(B)] 63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to August 31, 2022; [and] (B) [(C)] 59 or lower on or after September 1, 2022; (C) 57 or lower on or after September 1, 2025; and (D) 55 or lower on or after September 1, 2028; (2) for climate zone 3, an energy rating index of: (A) [65 or lower from September 1, 2016, to August 31, 2019; [(B)] 63 or lower from September 1, 2019, to August 31, 2022; [and] (B) [(C)] 59 or lower on or after September 1, 2022; [and] (C) 57 or lower on or after September 1, 2025; and (D) 55 or lower on or after September 1, 2028; and (3) for climate zone 4, an energy rating index of: (A) [69 or lower from September 1, 2016, to August 31, 2019; [(B)] 67 or lower from September 1, 2019, to August 31, 2022; [and] (B) [(C)] 63 or lower on or after September 1, 2022; (C) 61 or lower on or after September 1, 2025; and (D) 59 or lower on or after September 1, 2028. (k) This subsection and Subsection (j) expire September 1, 2031 [2025]. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. * * * * *