Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3240 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Klick (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3240
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
3- May 11, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4- Human Services; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
6- May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3240 By: Miles
1+By: Klick H.B. No. 3240
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
136 relating to the composition of the Long-Term Care Facilities
147 Council and rules related to and the imposition of administrative
158 penalties against certain long-term care facilities.
169 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1710 SECTION 1. Section 531.0581(b), Government Code, is amended
1811 to read as follows:
1912 (b) The executive commissioner shall establish a Long-Term
2013 Care Facilities Council as a permanent advisory committee to the
2114 commission. The council is composed of the following members
2215 appointed by the executive commissioner:
2316 (1) at least one member who is a for-profit nursing
2417 facility provider;
2518 (2) at least one member who is a nonprofit nursing
2619 facility provider;
2720 (3) at least one member who is an assisted living
2821 services provider;
2922 (4) at least one member responsible for survey
3023 enforcement within the state survey and certification agency;
3124 (5) at least one member responsible for survey
3225 inspection within the state survey and certification agency;
3326 (6) at least one member of the state agency
3427 responsible for informal dispute resolution;
3528 (7) at least one member with expertise in Medicaid
3629 quality-based payment systems for long-term care facilities;
3730 (8) at least one member who is a practicing medical
3831 director of a long-term care facility; [and]
3932 (9) at least one member who is a physician with
4033 expertise in infectious disease or public health; and
4134 (10) at least one member who is a community-based
4235 provider at an intermediate care facility for individuals with
4336 intellectual or developmental disabilities licensed under Chapter
4437 252, Health and Safety Code.
4538 SECTION 2. Section 252.065(b), Health and Safety Code, is
4639 amended to read as follows:
4740 (b) The penalty for a facility with fewer than 60 beds shall
4841 be not less than $100 or more than $1,000 for each violation. The
4942 penalty for a facility with 60 beds or more shall be not less than
5043 $100 or more than $5,000 for each violation. Each day a violation
5144 occurs or continues is a separate violation for purposes of
5245 imposing a penalty. The total amount of penalties [a penalty]
5346 assessed under this subsection for an on-site regulatory visit or
5447 complaint investigation, regardless of the duration of any ongoing
5548 violations, [for each day a violation occurs or continues] may not
5649 exceed:
5750 (1) $5,000 for a facility with fewer than 60 beds; and
5851 (2) $25,000 for a facility with 60 beds or more.
59- SECTION 3. Section 161.089, Human Resources Code, is
60- amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
61- read as follows:
52+ SECTION 3. Section 161.089(c), Human Resources Code, is
53+ amended to read as follows:
6254 (c) After consulting with appropriate stakeholders, the
6355 executive commissioner shall develop and adopt rules regarding the
6456 imposition of administrative penalties under this section. The
6557 rules must:
6658 (1) specify the types of violations that warrant
6759 imposition of an administrative penalty;
6860 (2) establish a schedule of progressive
6961 administrative penalties in accordance with the relative type,
7062 frequency, and seriousness of a violation;
7163 (3) prescribe reasonable amounts to be imposed for
7264 each violation giving rise to an administrative penalty, subject to
7365 Subdivision (4);
7466 (4) authorize the imposition of an administrative
7567 penalty in an amount not to exceed $5,000 for each violation;
7668 (5) provide that a provider commits a separate
7769 violation each day the provider continues to violate the law or
7870 rule;
7971 (6) ensure standard and consistent application of
8072 administrative penalties throughout the state; [and]
8173 (7) provide for an administrative appeals process to
8274 adjudicate claims and appeals relating to the imposition of an
8375 administrative penalty under this section that is in accordance
84- with Chapter 2001, Government Code; and
76+ with Chapter 2001, Government Code;
8577 (8) ensure standard and consistent interpretation of
8678 service delivery rules and consistent application of
87- administrative penalties throughout this state.
88- (c-1) On adoption of the rules under Subsection (c), the
89- executive commissioner shall develop interpretative guidelines for
90- regulatory staff and providers regarding the imposition of
91- administrative penalties under this section.
79+ administrative penalties throughout this state; and
80+ (9) include interpretative guidelines for regulatory
81+ staff and providers regarding the imposition of administrative
82+ penalties under this section.
9283 SECTION 4. Not later than December 1, 2021, the executive
9384 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
9485 adopt the rules necessary to implement the changes in law made by
9586 this Act.
9687 SECTION 5. The Health and Human Services Commission may not
9788 assess a penalty under Section 161.089, Human Resources Code, as
9889 amended by this Act, until the executive commissioner of the Health
99- and Human Services Commission:
100- (1) adopts the rules necessary to implement Section
101- 161.089(c)(8), Human Resources Code, as added by this Act; and
102- (2) develops the interpretive guidelines required by
103- Section 161.089(c-1), Human Resources Code, as added by this Act.
90+ and Human Services Commission adopts the rules necessary to
91+ implement Sections 161.089(c)(8) and (9), Human Resources Code, as
92+ added by this Act.
10493 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
10594 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
10695 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
10796 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
10897 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
109- * * * * *