Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3250 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021