1 | | - | H.B. No. 3286 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Schofield, Gates (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 3286 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Transportation; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3286 By: Alvarado |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the overnight parking of a commercial motor vehicle |
---|
6 | 14 | | near certain apartment complexes. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 545, Transportation Code, |
---|
9 | 17 | | is amended by adding Section 545.3075 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 545.3075. OVERNIGHT PARKING OF COMMERCIAL MOTOR |
---|
11 | 19 | | VEHICLE NEAR CERTAIN APARTMENT COMPLEXES. (a) In this section: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) "Apartment complex" means two or more dwellings in |
---|
13 | 21 | | one or more buildings that are owned by the same owner, located on |
---|
14 | 22 | | the same lot or tract, and managed by the same owner, agent, or |
---|
15 | 23 | | management company. |
---|
16 | 24 | | (2) "Commercial motor vehicle" has the meaning |
---|
17 | 25 | | assigned by Section 545.307. |
---|
18 | 26 | | (b) This section applies only to the unincorporated area of |
---|
19 | 27 | | a county with a population of more than 3.3 million. |
---|
20 | 28 | | (c) The owner or manager of an apartment complex may make a |
---|
21 | 29 | | request to the county in which the apartment complex is located for |
---|
22 | 30 | | the posting of official signs prohibiting the parking of a |
---|
23 | 31 | | commercial motor vehicle in a public right-of-way adjacent to the |
---|
24 | 32 | | complex after 10 p.m. and before 6 a.m. A request under this |
---|
25 | 33 | | subsection must be signed and in writing. |
---|
26 | 34 | | (d) A county receiving a request under Subsection (c) may |
---|
27 | 35 | | post one or more signs as requested or as the county determines to |
---|
28 | 36 | | be necessary. |
---|
29 | 37 | | (e) A sign posted under Subsection (d) must: |
---|
30 | 38 | | (1) be posted in the public right-of-way: |
---|
31 | 39 | | (A) not more than 10 feet from the property line |
---|
32 | 40 | | of the apartment complex; and |
---|
33 | 41 | | (B) facing the roadway; and |
---|
34 | 42 | | (2) include: |
---|
35 | 43 | | (A) a statement, in letters at least two inches |
---|
36 | 44 | | in height, that parking of a commercial motor vehicle is prohibited |
---|
37 | 45 | | from 10 p.m. to 6 a.m. in the public right-of-way or portion of the |
---|
38 | 46 | | public right-of-way; and |
---|
39 | 47 | | (B) arrows clearly indicating the area of the |
---|
40 | 48 | | public right-of-way subject to the parking restriction. |
---|
41 | 49 | | (f) This section does not apply to a vehicle owned by a |
---|
42 | 50 | | commercial establishment that is parked in the public right-of-way |
---|
43 | 51 | | adjacent to the property where the establishment is located. |
---|
44 | 52 | | (g) This section does not apply to public rights-of-way that |
---|
45 | 53 | | are part of the state highway system. |
---|
46 | 54 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
49 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3286 was passed by the House on May |
---|
50 | | - | 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 10, 2 present, not |
---|
51 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
52 | | - | No. 3286 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 12, |
---|
53 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
56 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3286 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
57 | | - | amendments, on May 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
58 | | - | 1. |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
61 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Date |
---|
63 | | - | __________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 55 | + | * * * * * |
---|