Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3287 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: González of El Paso, et al. H.B. No. 3287
2- (Senate Sponsor - Hughes)
3- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
4- May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
5- Human Services; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
6- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
7- May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
8-Click here to see the committee vote
9- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3287 By: Seliger
1+87R7214 BDP-F
2+ By: González of El Paso, Lozano, Anderson, H.B. No. 3287
3+ Frank, Hinojosa, et al.
104
115
126 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
137 AN ACT
148 relating to the provision of certain co-navigation services to
159 persons who are deaf-blind.
1610 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1711 SECTION 1. Section 81.001, Human Resources Code, is amended
1812 by adding Subdivision (1) to read as follows:
1913 (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
2014 Commission.
2115 SECTION 2. Chapter 81, Human Resources Code, is amended by
2216 adding Section 81.014 to read as follows:
2317 Sec. 81.014. CO-NAVIGATION SERVICES PROGRAM FOR PERSONS WHO
2418 ARE DEAF-BLIND. (a) In this section:
2519 (1) "Communication mode" includes communication
2620 through:
2721 (A) auditory amplification, such as through a
2822 personal hearing aid or assistive listening device;
2923 (B) American Sign Language or Signed English by
3024 both tactile and visual means; and
3125 (C) protactile language.
3226 (2) "Co-navigation services" means services provided
3327 to a person who is deaf-blind that assist the person to physically
3428 access the person's environment and to make informed decisions. The
3529 term includes providing visual and environmental information or
3630 sighted guide services and assisting with communication
3731 accessibility by communicating in the preferred language and
3832 communication mode of the person who is deaf-blind. The term does
3933 not include performing any of the following for the person:
4034 (A) providing personal care services to the
4135 person;
4236 (B) completing ordinary errands for the person;
4337 (C) making decisions for the person;
4438 (D) teaching or otherwise instructing the
4539 person; or
4640 (E) interpreting for the person in a formal
4741 setting, including a medical, legal, or business setting.
4842 (3) "Co-navigator" means a person who is specially
4943 trained to provide co-navigation services.
5044 (4) "Program" means the deaf-blind co-navigation
5145 services program.
5246 (5) "Protactile language" means a method of
5347 communication based on touch that is used by persons who are
5448 deaf-blind.
5549 (b) The commission shall operate a statewide co-navigation
5650 services program through which:
5751 (1) co-navigation services are provided by
5852 co-navigators; and
5953 (2) the commission reimburses the co-navigators for
6054 the provision of the services.
6155 (c) The executive commissioner by rule shall establish
6256 reimbursement rates to be paid to a co-navigator under the program.
6357 The reimbursement rates must use a tiered wage scale that is based
6458 on the co-navigator's:
6559 (1) level of training in communication modes for
6660 persons who are deaf-blind and in sighted guide-mobility
6761 techniques; and
6862 (2) fluency and skill in communication modes and
6963 sighted guide-mobility for persons who are deaf-blind.
7064 (d) The commission shall ensure that quality co-navigation
7165 services are provided under the program by:
7266 (1) monitoring the compliance of co-navigators with
7367 program rules;
7468 (2) developing funding sources for the program that
7569 are in addition to state sources and will reduce reliance on the
7670 state sources for continuation of the program; and
7771 (3) providing funding and technical assistance for
7872 training programs for:
7973 (A) co-navigators under the program; and
8074 (B) persons who are deaf-blind to enable those
8175 persons to effectively use the services offered under the program.
8276 (e) The executive commissioner may establish an advisory
8377 committee to advise the commission in developing and operating the
8478 program, including operating the program in a manner that ensures
8579 the efficient use of state money. Subject to Section 2110.002,
8680 Government Code, the executive commissioner shall determine the
8781 number of members serving on the advisory committee, which must
8882 include persons who are deaf-blind and other stakeholders.
8983 (f) The executive commissioner may adopt rules necessary
9084 to:
9185 (1) operate the program in a manner that is efficient
9286 and maximizes the number of persons served; and
9387 (2) ensure that co-navigators receiving reimbursement
9488 under the program have adequate training to provide co-navigation
9589 services.
9690 SECTION 3. Not later than September 1, 2022:
9791 (1) the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
9892 Services Commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
9993 Section 81.014, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act; and
10094 (2) the commission shall begin operating the program
10195 required by that section.
102- SECTION 4. The Health and Human Services Commission is
103- required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
104- legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
105- the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
106- purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
107- provision of this Act using other appropriations that are available
108- for that purpose.
109- SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
110- * * * * *
96+ SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.