Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3298 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Allison, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 3298
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2021;
3- May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Education; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 8, Nays 3; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+By: Allison, Guillen H.B. No. 3298
72
83
94 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
105 AN ACT
116 relating to computer science and technology education, training,
127 and curriculum.
138 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
149 SECTION 1. Subchapter J, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
1510 amended by adding Section 21.466 to read as follows:
1611 Sec. 21.466. COMPUTER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY APPLICATIONS
1712 PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT GRANT PROGRAM. (a) In this section,
1813 "institution of higher education" has the meaning assigned by
1914 Section 61.003.
2015 (b) The commissioner shall establish a competitive
2116 professional development grant program to encourage teachers to:
2217 (1) obtain computer science certification; and
2318 (2) continue professional development in coding,
2419 computational thinking, cybersecurity, and computer science
2520 education.
2621 (c) From money appropriated for the purpose, the
2722 commissioner shall make grants to eligible providers that offer:
2823 (1) professional development for classroom teachers
2924 to ensure teachers maintain a working knowledge of current computer
3025 industry standard tools and resources; and
3126 (2) training for computer science certification for
3227 teachers in accordance with certification requirements adopted by
3328 the State Board for Educator Certification.
3429 (d) To be eligible to receive a grant under this section, a
3530 provider must:
3631 (1) be an institution of higher education, regional
3732 education service center, or school district or partnership of
3833 multiple school districts or a nonprofit entity approved by the
3934 commissioner that has demonstrated experience in providing
4035 professional development through a statewide network; and
4136 (2) meet eligibility standards established by
4237 commissioner rule.
4338 (e) An eligible provider receiving a grant under this
4439 section must:
4540 (1) provide the training or professional development
4641 described by Subsection (c) and establish professional development
4742 hubs in each education service center region;
4843 (2) serve high-need campuses;
4944 (3) have established partnerships with institution of
5045 higher education faculty with expertise in cybersecurity,
5146 computing, and computer science education; and
5247 (4) develop partnerships with computer industry
5348 professionals.
5449 (f) The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
5550 implement this section.
5651 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
5752 amended by adding Section 28.0181 to read as follows:
5853 Sec. 28.0181. COMPUTER SCIENCE STRATEGIC ADVISORY
5954 COMMITTEE. (a) In this section, "advisory committee" means the
6055 computer science strategic advisory committee established under
6156 this section.
6257 (b) The agency shall establish the computer science
6358 strategic advisory committee as a permanent advisory committee to
6459 the agency to develop and provide recommendations for increasing
6560 computer science instruction and participation in public schools.
6661 (c) The advisory committee is composed of at least 11
6762 members. The members must include:
6863 (1) two members appointed by the governor;
6964 (2) two members appointed by the lieutenant governor;
7065 (3) two members appointed by the speaker of the house
7166 of representatives;
7267 (4) one member appointed by the chair of the senate
7368 committee with primary jurisdiction over primary and secondary
7469 education;
7570 (5) one member appointed by the chair of the senate
7671 committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education;
7772 (6) one member appointed by the chair of the house of
7873 representatives committee with primary jurisdiction over primary
7974 and secondary education;
8075 (7) one member appointed by the chair of the house of
8176 representatives committee with primary jurisdiction over higher
8277 education;
8378 (8) one member appointed by the chair of the State
8479 Board of Education; and
8580 (9) any other members added by the advisory committee
8681 in a manner determined by the committee in the committee's
8782 discretion.
8883 (d) In appointing members to the advisory committee, the
8984 governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
9085 representatives shall coordinate appointments to ensure that the
9186 six individuals appointed to the advisory committee collectively by
9287 those officers include:
9388 (1) three educators who teach in a public school and
9489 are certified in computer science;
9590 (2) one parent or person standing in parental relation
9691 to a student enrolled in a public school;
9792 (3) one person employed in the technology industry;
9893 and
9994 (4) one faculty member of an institution of higher
10095 education.
10196 (e) The governor shall designate a member of the advisory
10297 committee as the presiding officer of the advisory committee to
10398 serve in that capacity at the pleasure of the governor.
10499 (f) The advisory committee may hold public meetings.
105100 (g) Members of the advisory committee are not entitled to
106101 compensation but are entitled to reimbursement for actual and
107102 necessary expenses incurred in fulfilling committee duties.
108103 (h) The agency shall appoint an agency employee to support
109104 the advisory committee.
110105 (i) Not later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year, the
111106 advisory committee shall submit to the governor and the legislature
112107 a report that includes recommended changes to state law, including
113108 funding proposals and timelines for the implementation of the
114109 recommended changes. The report shall include recommendations that
115110 are intended to:
116111 (1) increase the number of certified computer science
117112 teachers;
118113 (2) increase the number of public high schools
119114 offering computer science courses;
120115 (3) increase the number of high school students
121116 enrolled in computer science courses;
122117 (4) encourage the enrollment of diverse student
123118 populations in computer science courses; and
124119 (5) expand computer science learning opportunities,
125120 including computer programming, computer coding, cybersecurity,
126121 and computational thinking, in public schools.
127122 SECTION 3. Section 5, Chapter 1149 (H.B. 2984), Acts of the
128123 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, is repealed.
129124 SECTION 4. Not later than December 31, 2021, the
130125 commissioner of education shall establish the grant program
131126 required under Section 21.466, Education Code, as added by this
132127 Act.
133128 SECTION 5. As soon as practicable after the effective date
134129 of this Act, the appropriate persons, as provided by Section
135130 28.0181(c), Education Code, as added by this Act, shall appoint
136131 members to the computer science strategic advisory committee.
137132 SECTION 6. Not later than December 31, 2022, the State Board
138133 of Education shall review and revise, as needed, the essential
139134 knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum as
140135 required by Section 28.002(c-3), Education Code, as added by
141136 Chapter 1149 (H.B. 2984), Acts of the 86th Legislature, Regular
142137 Session, 2019.
143138 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
144139 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
145140 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
146141 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
147142 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
148- * * * * *