Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3319 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3319
1+By: Meyer, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3319
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
3+ May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Transportation; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to certain measures to promote compliance with and improve
612 public awareness of the state's move over or slow down law
713 concerning the passing of certain vehicles.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is
1016 amended by adding Section 1001.1101 to read as follows:
1117 Sec. 1001.1101. INFORMATION RELATING TO PASSING CERTAIN
1218 VEHICLES. (a) The commission by rule shall require that
1319 information relating to the requirements of Section 545.157,
1420 Transportation Code, concerning the passing of certain vehicles be
1521 included in the curriculum of each driver education course or
1622 driving safety course.
1723 (b) In developing rules under this section, the commission
1824 shall consult with the Department of Public Safety.
1925 SECTION 2. Subchapter H, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
2026 is amended by adding Section 201.623 to read as follows:
2127 Sec. 201.623. MOVE OVER OR SLOW DOWN CAMPAIGN. (a) The
2228 department shall develop and implement a move over or slow down
2329 public awareness campaign designed to promote compliance with and
2430 improve public awareness of the requirements of Section 545.157
2531 concerning the passing of certain vehicles.
2632 (b) The department may consult and coordinate with the
2733 Department of Public Safety and the Texas Department of Motor
2834 Vehicles as the department considers necessary to develop or
2935 implement the campaign.
3036 (c) In implementing the campaign, the department may engage
3137 in online advocacy, issue public service announcements, distribute
3238 materials, and post signage on roadways relating to the campaign.
3339 (d) The department may pay the costs of the campaign and its
3440 administration from:
3541 (1) gifts, grants, or donations;
3642 (2) matching funds; and
3743 (3) other funds made available for that purpose,
3844 including available department revenue.
3945 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than May 1, 2022, the Texas
4046 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules
4147 required by Section 1001.1101, Education Code, as added by this
4248 Act.
4349 (b) Each driver education or driving safety course held on
4450 or after September 1, 2022, shall include in the course's
4551 curriculum the information required by the rules adopted under
4652 Section 1001.1101, Education Code, as added by this Act.
4753 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
48- ______________________________ ______________________________
49- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
50- I certify that H.B. No. 3319 was passed by the House on May
51- 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 119, Nays 24, 2 present, not
52- voting.
53- ______________________________
54- Chief Clerk of the House
55- I certify that H.B. No. 3319 was passed by the Senate on May
56- 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
57- ______________________________
58- Secretary of the Senate
59- APPROVED: _____________________
60- Date
61- _____________________
62- Governor
54+ * * * * *