Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3324 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3324
1+By: Morales of Maverick (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 3324
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
3+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Transportation; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3324 By: Blanco
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the designation of a portion of Interstate Highway 10 as
614 the U.S. Border Patrol Agent Rogelio Martinez Memorial Highway.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
917 is amended by adding Section 225.190 to read as follows:
1018 Sec. 225.190. U.S. BORDER PATROL AGENT ROGELIO MARTINEZ
1119 MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a) The portion of Interstate Highway 10 in
1220 Culberson County between mile marker 150 and mile marker 155 is
1321 designated as the U.S. Border Patrol Agent Rogelio Martinez
1422 Memorial Highway. The designation is in addition to any other
1523 designation.
1624 (b) Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
1725 (1) design and construct markers indicating the
1826 designation as the U.S. Border Patrol Agent Rogelio Martinez
1927 Memorial Highway and any other appropriate information; and
2028 (2) erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
2129 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
2230 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
23- ______________________________ ______________________________
24- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
25- I certify that H.B. No. 3324 was passed by the House on May 8,
26- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 2, 2 present, not
27- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
28- No. 3324 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 2,
29- 1 present, not voting.
30- ______________________________
31- Chief Clerk of the House
32- I certify that H.B. No. 3324 was passed by the Senate, with
33- amendments, on May 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
34- 0.
35- ______________________________
36- Secretary of the Senate
37- APPROVED: __________________
38- Date
39- __________________
40- Governor
31+ * * * * *