Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 29, 2021