Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3328 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/09/2021

                            87R2330 SRA-F
 By: Bernal H.B. No. 3328


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the periodic review and expiration dates of state and
 local tax preferences.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 3, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 320A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 320A. REVIEW OF STATE AND LOCAL TAX PREFERENCES
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 320A.0001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "tax
 preference" means a credit, discount, exclusion, exemption,
 refund, special valuation, special accounting treatment, special
 rate, or special method of reporting authorized by state law that
 relates to a state or local tax imposed in this state.
 SUBCHAPTER B. SCHEDULE FOR PERIODIC REVIEW OF STATE AND LOCAL TAX
 PREFERENCES
 Sec. 320A.0051.  DEVELOPMENT AND BIENNIAL MODIFICATION OF
 STATE AND LOCAL TAX PREFERENCE REVIEW SCHEDULE. (a) The
 comptroller shall:
 (1)  identify each state tax preference and each local
 tax preference;
 (2)  develop a state and local tax preference review
 schedule under which each identified tax preference is reviewed
 once during each six-year period; and
 (3)  specifically identify on the schedule each of the
 tax preferences the Legislative Budget Board must review for
 purposes of the next preliminary report required by Section
 320A.0151.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), in developing the
 schedule, the comptroller shall give priority to scheduling for
 review the tax preferences that result in the greatest reduction in
 revenue derived from the taxes to which the tax preferences relate.
 (c)  In developing the schedule, the comptroller may
 schedule:
 (1)  all tax preferences authorized in the same chapter
 of the Tax Code for review at the same time; and
 (2)  the initial review of a tax preference that has an
 expiration date for any date the comptroller determines is
 appropriate.
 (d)  The comptroller shall revise the schedule biennially
 only to:
 (1)  add to the schedule a tax preference that was
 enacted or authorized after the comptroller developed the most
 recent schedule;
 (2)  delete from the schedule a tax preference that was
 repealed or that expired after the comptroller developed the most
 recent schedule;
 (3)  update the review dates of the tax preferences for
 which reviews were conducted after the comptroller developed the
 most recent schedule; and
 (4)  update the tax preferences identified under
 Subsection (a)(3).
 Sec. 320A.0052.  PUBLIC COMMENT. The comptroller shall
 provide a process by which the public may comment on the state and
 local tax preference review schedule under Section 320A.0051. The
 comptroller shall consider those comments in developing or revising
 the schedule.
 Sec. 320A.0053.  SCHEDULE PROVIDED TO LEGISLATIVE BUDGET
 BOARD. Not later than December 1 of each odd-numbered year, the
 comptroller shall provide the state and local tax preference review
 schedule under Section 320A.0051 to the Legislative Budget Board.
 SUBCHAPTER C. REVIEW OF STATE AND LOCAL TAX PREFERENCES
 Sec. 320A.0101.  PERIODIC REVIEW OF TAX PREFERENCES. The
 Legislative Budget Board shall periodically review each state tax
 preference and each local tax preference according to the state and
 local tax preference review schedule the comptroller provides under
 Section 320A.0053. In reviewing a tax preference, the board shall:
 (1)  determine the intended purpose of the tax
 preference; and
 (2)  evaluate:
 (A)  whether the tax preference accomplishes its
 intended purpose;
 (B)  whether the tax preference is inefficient,
 ineffective, or unnecessary, or the intended purpose of the tax
 preference is a low priority for this state; and
 (C)  the effect of the tax preference on economic
 development, the number of high-wage jobs, funding for public
 services, the distribution of the tax burden by income class and
 industry or business class, and total income by income class in this
 state.
 Sec. 320A.0102.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. As requested by
 the Legislative Budget Board, a state governmental entity shall
 provide administrative support to the board as reasonable and
 necessary for the board to perform the review required by Section
 320A.0101.
 SUBCHAPTER D. RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING REVIEWED TAX PREFERENCES
 Sec. 320A.0151.  PRELIMINARY REPORT. Not later than
 September 1 of each even-numbered year, the Legislative Budget
 Board shall provide to the Senate Finance Committee, or its
 successor, and the House Ways and Means Committee, or its
 successor, a preliminary report on the reviews of tax preferences
 conducted under Section 320A.0101. The report must include drafts
 of any proposed legislation needed to implement the board's
 recommendations.
 Sec. 320A.0152.  FINAL REPORT. The Senate Finance
 Committee, or its successor, and the House Ways and Means
 Committee, or its successor, shall review and may modify the
 preliminary report and proposed legislation provided to the
 committees under Section 320A.0151. Not later than December 1 of
 each even-numbered year, the committees shall provide to the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives a final report on the reviews of tax preferences.
 The final report must include:
 (1)  with respect to each tax preference examined, a
 recommendation to:
 (A)  continue the tax preference;
 (B)  amend a provision relating to the tax
 preference; or
 (C)  repeal the tax preference;
 (2)  a complete explanation of each recommendation
 under Subdivision (1);
 (3)  proposed legislation necessary to implement the
 findings of the final report; and
 (4)  a description of any changes to the preliminary
 report that were made in the final report, including a description
 of the reasons for each change.
 Sec. 320A.0153.  PUBLIC HEARING ON FINAL REPORT. The Senate
 Finance Committee, or its successor, and the House Ways and Means
 Committee, or its successor, shall hold a joint public hearing on
 the final report and proposed legislation provided under Section
 320A.0152.
 SUBCHAPTER E. EXPIRATION OF TAX PREFERENCES
 Sec. 320A.0201.  EXPIRATION; REQUIRED STATEMENT. (a) A tax
 preference that becomes law on or after January 1, 2022, expires
 six years after the date the tax preference takes effect, unless the
 legislature provides for an earlier or later expiration date. The
 law enacting a tax preference described by this subsection must
 include the following statement: "This tax preference expires six
 years after its effective date unless the legislature provides for
 an earlier or later expiration date." A tax preference described by
 this subsection that does not include the required statement
 expires as provided by this subsection.
 (b)  A tax preference that became law before January 1, 2022,
 and that remains in effect on that date expires January 1, 2028,
 unless the legislature provides for an earlier or later expiration
 date.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Notwithstanding Section 320A.0053,
 Government Code, as added by this Act, the comptroller of public
 accounts shall submit the initial state and local tax preference
 review schedule required by that section not later than January 15,
 2022.
 (b)  The Legislative Budget Board shall submit the initial
 preliminary report required by Section 320A.0151, Government Code,
 as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2022.
 (c)  The Senate Finance Committee and the House Ways and
 Means Committee shall submit the initial final report required by
 Section 320A.0152, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than December 1, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 87th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2021, requiring the legislature to provide for a
 periodic review of state and local tax preferences and providing
 for the expiration of those tax preferences after six years, or at
 another time prescribed by the legislature, is approved by the
 voters. If that amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act
 has no effect.