Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3354 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Burrows (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3354
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the location of certain justice courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 292.001(d), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  A justice of the peace court may not be housed or
 conducted in a building located outside the court's precinct except
 as provided by Section 27.051(f) or 27.0515, Government Code, or
 unless the justice of the peace court is situated in the county
 courthouse in a county with a population of at least 305,000
 [275,000] persons and the county seat of which is located in the
 Llano Estacado region of this state [but no more than 285,000
 persons].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *