House | 05/11/2021 | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1588 | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Postponed 5/11/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Postponed 5/7/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Business & Industry | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Filed |