1 | | - | H.B. No. 3379 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Leman, et al. H.B. No. 3379 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst, et al.) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 5 | + | Human Services; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3379 By: Campbell |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the duty to report child abuse and neglect. |
---|
6 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Sections 261.101(a), (b), and (b-1), Family |
---|
8 | 17 | | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 18 | | (a) A person having reasonable cause to believe that a |
---|
10 | 19 | | child's physical or mental health or welfare has been adversely |
---|
11 | 20 | | affected by abuse or neglect by any person shall immediately make a |
---|
12 | 21 | | report as provided by this subchapter. |
---|
13 | 22 | | (b) If a professional has reasonable cause to believe that a |
---|
14 | 23 | | child has been abused or neglected or may be abused or neglected, or |
---|
15 | 24 | | that a child is a victim of an offense under Section 21.11, Penal |
---|
16 | 25 | | Code, and the professional has reasonable cause to believe that the |
---|
17 | 26 | | child has been abused as defined by Section 261.001, the |
---|
18 | 27 | | professional shall make a report not later than the 48th hour after |
---|
19 | 28 | | the hour the professional first has reasonable cause to believe |
---|
20 | 29 | | [suspects] that the child has been or may be abused or neglected or |
---|
21 | 30 | | is a victim of an offense under Section 21.11, Penal Code. A |
---|
22 | 31 | | professional may not delegate to or rely on another person to make |
---|
23 | 32 | | the report. In this subsection, "professional" means an individual |
---|
24 | 33 | | who is licensed or certified by the state or who is an employee of a |
---|
25 | 34 | | facility licensed, certified, or operated by the state and who, in |
---|
26 | 35 | | the normal course of official duties or duties for which a license |
---|
27 | 36 | | or certification is required, has direct contact with children. |
---|
28 | 37 | | The term includes teachers, nurses, doctors, day-care employees, |
---|
29 | 38 | | employees of a clinic or health care facility that provides |
---|
30 | 39 | | reproductive services, juvenile probation officers, and juvenile |
---|
31 | 40 | | detention or correctional officers. |
---|
32 | 41 | | (b-1) In addition to the duty to make a report under |
---|
33 | 42 | | Subsection (a) or (b), a person or professional shall make a report |
---|
34 | 43 | | in the manner required by Subsection (a) or (b), as applicable, if |
---|
35 | 44 | | the person or professional has reasonable cause to believe that an |
---|
36 | 45 | | adult was a victim of abuse or neglect as a child and the person or |
---|
37 | 46 | | professional determines in good faith that disclosure of the |
---|
38 | 47 | | information is necessary to protect the health and safety of: |
---|
39 | 48 | | (1) another child; or |
---|
40 | 49 | | (2) an elderly person or person with a disability as |
---|
41 | 50 | | defined by Section 48.002, Human Resources Code. |
---|
42 | 51 | | SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
43 | 52 | | a report of suspected abuse or neglect of a child that is made on or |
---|
44 | 53 | | after the effective date of this Act. A report of suspected abuse |
---|
45 | 54 | | or neglect that is made before that date is governed by the law in |
---|
46 | 55 | | effect on the date the report was made, and that law is continued in |
---|
47 | 56 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
48 | 57 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3379 was passed by the House on April |
---|
52 | | - | 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 112, Nays 33, 1 present, not |
---|
53 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
54 | | - | No. 3379 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 9, |
---|
55 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
58 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3379 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
59 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
60 | | - | 0. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
63 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Date |
---|
65 | | - | __________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 58 | + | * * * * * |
---|