Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3387 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Rogers, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 3387
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
3- May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
4- Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by
5- the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+87R16331 JAM-D
2+ By: Rogers, Harris, Price, Ashby, Landgraf H.B. No. 3387
73
84
95 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
106 AN ACT
117 relating to the authorization for certain land applications and
128 disposal of dairy waste.
139 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1410 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 361, Health and Safety
1511 Code, is amended by adding Section 361.1215 to read as follows:
1612 Sec. 361.1215. PERMISSIVE LAND APPLICATION OF DAIRY WASTE.
1713 (a) In this section, "dairy waste" means milk, milk by-products, or
1814 milk processing waste that is spilled, spoiled, adulterated,
1915 unmarketable, stranded, or otherwise unfit for human consumption
2016 produced by a dairy operation.
2117 (b) Notwithstanding any other law, the commission shall
2218 issue an authorization by rule for land application of dairy waste.
2319 (c) The commission shall adopt rules governing the land
2420 application of dairy waste authorized under this section.
2521 (d) Rules adopted under Subsection (c) must:
2622 (1) minimize the risk of water quality impairment
2723 caused by the land application; and
2824 (2) prescribe the conditions under which an
2925 authorization is issued, including:
3026 (A) the duration of the authorization;
3127 (B) the location of the land application unit;
3228 (C) the maximum quantity or application rate of
3329 dairy waste that may be applied or disposed of under the
3430 authorization;
3531 (D) the suggested agronomic application rate for
3632 the dairy waste or other beneficial uses of the dairy waste; and
3733 (E) best management practices for the handling
3834 and disposal of dairy waste.
3935 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 26, Water Code, is amended
4036 by adding Section 26.0481 to read as follows:
4137 Sec. 26.0481. DISPOSAL OF DAIRY WASTE IN RETENTION
4238 FACILITY. (a) In this section, "dairy waste" means milk, milk
4339 by-products, or milk processing waste that is spilled, spoiled,
4440 adulterated, unmarketable, stranded, or otherwise unfit for human
4541 consumption produced at a concentrated animal feeding operation.
4642 (b) Notwithstanding any other law and to the extent
4743 permitted by federal law, the commission shall adopt rules under
4844 this section to allow:
4945 (1) the disposal of dairy waste from a concentrated
5046 animal feeding operation into a control or retention facility,
5147 including a lagoon or playa, as that term is defined by Section
5248 26.048; and
5349 (2) the land application by irrigation associated with
5450 the disposal described by Subdivision (1).
5551 (c) Rules adopted under Subsection (b) must:
5652 (1) minimize the risk of water quality impairment
5753 caused by:
5854 (A) the disposal of dairy waste into the control
5955 or retention facility; and
6056 (B) the land application by irrigation
6157 associated with the disposal described by Paragraph (A); and
6258 (2) require best management practices to ensure that
6359 the disposal of dairy waste into the control or retention facility
6460 does not impair water quality.
6561 SECTION 3. Not later than March 1, 2022, the Texas
6662 Commission on Environmental Quality shall adopt rules necessary to
6763 implement Section 361.1215, Health and Safety Code, and Section
6864 26.0481, Water Code, as added by this Act.
6965 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
70- * * * * *