Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021