Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021