Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3408 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021