House | 05/03/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Filed |