Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021